IA HF2286 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property. (Formerly HSB 596.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting cities and counties from imposing time-of-sale requirements on transactions involving real property. (Formerly HSB 596.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 595. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 588. |
2018-03-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 459. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 526. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 8. S.J. 525. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2215. S.J. 524. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2215. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 407. |
2018-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 326. |
2018-02-20 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 328. |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 77, nays 21. H.J. 320. |
2018-02-20 | House | Amendment H-8050 lost. H.J. 320. |
2018-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8050 filed. H.J. 308. |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 234. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3090 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB596 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2215 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.
HSB596 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2215 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 525.