IA SF2200 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa business corporation Act by removing limitations imposed on shareholders making long-term arrangements affecting the affairs of the corporation, and by providing for the delivery of financial information to shareholders. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa business corporation Act by removing limitations imposed on shareholders making long-term arrangements affecting the affairs of the corporation, and by providing for the delivery of financial information to shareholders. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 651. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 633. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 513. |
2014-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 467. |
2014-03-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 461. |
2014-03-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2277. H.J. 461. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 384. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 382. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 441. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 437. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5033 filed, adopted. S.J. 437. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 276. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 267. |