IA SF2198 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 692.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 692.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa prescription monitoring program, including by establishing an advisory committee, authorizing a registration surcharge, expanding information collection and reporting requirements, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3071.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa prescription monitoring program, including by establishing an advisory committee, authorizing a registration surcharge, expanding information collection and reporting requirements, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3071.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 692. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 256. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 252. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3071 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2198 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2198.html |