IA SF2195 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 868.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 3093.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 3093.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 868. |
2014-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-22 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 826. |
2014-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 733. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 779. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 778. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5135. S.J. 777. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5135. S.J. 736. |
2014-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 679. |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 676. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendments H-8152, H-8153, and H-8154 out of order. H.J. 676. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendment H-8151 adopted. H.J. 676. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendments H-8161, H-8162, and H-8163 withdrawn. H.J. 675. |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendment H-8175 lost. H.J. 675. |
2014-03-27 | House | Amendment H-8175 to H-8151 filed. H.J. 608. |
2014-03-26 | House | Amendments H-8161, H-8162, and H-8163 filed. H.J. 604. |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendments H-8151, H-8152, H-8153, and H-8154 filed. H.J. 585. |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 560. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 494. |
2014-03-12 | House | Subcommittee, Watts, Meyer, and R. Taylor. H.J. 488. |
2014-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 475. |
2014-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 474. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 533. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 533. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 273. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 266. |