IA SF2182 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases. (Formerly SSB 3039.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases. (Formerly SSB 3039.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 863.
2020-06-16SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862.
2020-06-10SenateMessage from House. S.J. 752.
2020-06-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2020-06-10HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 677.
2020-06-10HouseSubstituted for HF 2599. H.J. 677.
2020-06-04HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 643.
2020-06-04HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 642.
2020-06-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 675.
2020-06-04SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 671.
2020-02-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 242.
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 234.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3039 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2182.
HSB612 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 298.
HF2447 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
HF2599 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback