IA HF2599 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 449.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases. (Formerly HF 2447, HSB 612.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases. (Formerly HF 2447, HSB 612.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 449.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3039 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2182.
HSB612 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 298.
SF2182 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 242.
HF2447 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback