IA HSB612 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2182
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2447

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 298.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project and legal representation in child welfare cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 298.
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-10HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 12:15PM House Lounge.
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee: Jacobsen, Paustian and Wolfe. H.J. 173.
2020-01-30HouseBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SSB3039 (Related) 2020-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2182.
SF2182 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 242.
HF2447 (Replaced by) 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback