IA SF2179 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin.(Formerly SSB 3011.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin.(Formerly SSB 3011.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 585. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | HF 2462 substituted. S.J. 584. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2462. S.J. 445. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 195. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 191. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3011 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2179.
HSB652 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
HF2462 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
HSB652 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
HF2462 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.