IA HF2462 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin. (Formerly HSB 652.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin. (Formerly HSB 652.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–8095? (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–8095? (Y: 42 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 869. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 868. |
2022-06-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 604. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 588. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 5. S.J. 585. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5079 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 584. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2179. S.J. 584. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2179. S.J. 445. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 445. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 489. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 79, nays 20. H.J. 468. |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 468. |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8095, yeas 42, nays 57. H.J. 467. |
2022-03-02 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-8095, ruled not germane. H.J. 467. |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment H-8095 filed. H.J. 423. |
2022-02-21 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 298. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3011 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2179.
HSB652 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
SF2179 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.
HSB652 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
SF2179 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.