IA HSB652 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2179
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2462
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2462
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin.(See HF 2462.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to penalties for the manufacture, delivery, or possession with the intent to manufacture or deliver heroin.(See HF 2462.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 287. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:00AM RM 19. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Paustian, Gobble and Sunde. H.J. 177. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 175. |
2022-02-02 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3011 (Related) 2022-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2179.
SF2179 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.
HF2462 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
SF2179 (Replaced by) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 585.
HF2462 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 869.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB652 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB652.html |