IA SF2173 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of a simulated firearm or simulated explosive when committing a robbery, the criminal offense of intimidation, or other crimes, and providing penalties.(See SF 2360.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of a simulated firearm or simulated explosive when committing a robbery, the criminal offense of intimidation, or other crimes, and providing penalties.(See SF 2360.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360. S.J. 353. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Rowley. S.J. 193. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 178. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2360 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2173 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2173.html |