IA SF2163 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Fiscal note. HCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Fiscal note. HCS.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensing fees collected by the board of educational examiners, nullifying related administrative rules, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3047.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensing fees collected by the board of educational examiners, nullifying related administrative rules, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3047.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 506. |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee amendment H-8091 filed. H.J. 449. |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 447. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee, Highfill, T. Moore, and Winckler. H.J. 400. |
2016-03-01 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 354. |
2016-02-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 346. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 366. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 363. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5033 filed, lost. S.J. 363. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5028 adopted. S.J. 363. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Amendment S-5028 filed. S.J. 359. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 215. |