IA SF2132 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Referred to Commerce. H.J. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 3092.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters under the purview of the utilities division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 3092.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Referred to Commerce. H.J. 499. |
2014-02-27 | House | Amendments H-8048 and H-8049 filed. H.J. 372. |
2014-02-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 319. |
2014-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 312. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 337. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 336. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 222. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 218. |