IA SF2111 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a peace officer's search of garbage placed outside of a person's residence for waste collection in a publicly accessible area.(See SF 2296.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to a peace officer's search of garbage placed outside of a person's residence for waste collection in a publicly accessible area.(See SF 2296.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2296. S.J. 308. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 10:00AM Room G17. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Zaun. S.J. 160. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 146. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2296 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2111 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2111.html |