IA SF2094 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consideration of the educational setting of a minor child in a child custody proceeding.
Title
A bill for an act relating to consideration of the educational setting of a minor child in a child custody proceeding.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2022 12:30PM Room G17. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, J. Taylor, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 151. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 134. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2094 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2094.html |