IA SF2089 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 475.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act disqualifying a person convicted of human trafficking involving the use of a commercial motor vehicle from operating a commercial motor vehicle for life. (Formerly SSB 3021.)
Title
A bill for an act disqualifying a person convicted of human trafficking involving the use of a commercial motor vehicle from operating a commercial motor vehicle for life. (Formerly SSB 3021.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 475. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | HF 2235 substituted. S.J. 474. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2235. S.J. 429. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 166. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 157. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3021 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Reported out of committee as SF 2089.
HSB541 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174.
HF2235 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 593.
HSB541 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174.
HF2235 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2089 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2089.html |