IA SF2088 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287. S.J. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287. S.J. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a veterans treatment court in each judicial district. (See SF 2287.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a veterans treatment court in each judicial district. (See SF 2287.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2287. S.J. 340. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 8:30AM RM G17. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Hogg, and Nunn. S.J. 162. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 156. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2287 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2088 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2088.html |