IA SF207 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Petersen. S.J. 244.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Petersen. S.J. 244.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Petersen. S.J. 244. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 224. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1093 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB158 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
SF433 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
HF578 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
HSB158 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
SF433 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
HF578 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF207 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF207.html |