IA HF578 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 158.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 158.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 995. |
2017-04-12 | House | SF 433 substituted. H.J. 989. |
2017-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1328 filed, adopted. H.J. 988. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 567. |
Same As/Similar To
SF207 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Petersen. S.J. 244.
SSB1093 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB158 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
SF433 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
SSB1093 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB158 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
SF433 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF578 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF578.html |