IA HSB158 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to termination of parental rights and adoption proceedings, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506. |
2017-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 10:30AM House Lounge |
2017-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Carlin, Windschitl and Bennett. H.J. 452. |
2017-02-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF207 (Replaced by) 2017-02-08 - Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Petersen. S.J. 244.
SF433 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
HF578 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SSB1093 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF433 (Replaced by) 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
HF578 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SSB1093 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB158 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB158.html |