IA SF206 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 96.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 96.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to property division in dissolution proceedings relating to military disposable retired pay.
Title
A bill for an act relating to property division in dissolution proceedings relating to military disposable retired pay.
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 96. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 308. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 282. |