IA SF2054 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to special deer hunting licenses available to nonresident family members.
Title
A bill for an act relating to special deer hunting licenses available to nonresident family members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Boulton, and Cournoyer. S.J. 151. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 119. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2054 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2054.html |