IA SF2051 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2309. S.J. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2309. S.J. 279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to drivers who fail to stop at stop signs in school zones, and providing penalties.(See SF 2309.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to drivers who fail to stop at stop signs in school zones, and providing penalties.(See SF 2309.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2309. S.J. 279. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 3:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Celsi, and Koelker. S.J. 138. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 112. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2309 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 279.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2051 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2051.html |