IA SF2011 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the purchasing of a youth deer hunting license and tag.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the purchasing of a youth deer hunting license and tag.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2022 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Hall and Jeneary. H.J. 423. |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 322. |
2022-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 304. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 338. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 335. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 182. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Boulton, and Cournoyer. S.J. 99. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 62. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB608 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled).