IA HSB608 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2011
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled).
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the purchasing of a youth deer hunting license and tag.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the purchasing of a youth deer hunting license and tag.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 8:00AM RM 304.1 (Cancelled). |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Bradley and Brown-Powers. H.J. 119. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 116. |
2022-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF2011 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB608 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB608.html |