IA SF2005 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the eligibility of students enrolled in public schools or nonpublic schools in border states or in counties that border another state to compete in interscholastic athletic activities provided by public schools or nonpublic schools in the other state.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the eligibility of students enrolled in public schools or nonpublic schools in border states or in counties that border another state to compete in interscholastic athletic activities provided by public schools or nonpublic schools in the other state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM Room 315. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Cournoyer, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 98. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 42. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2005 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2005.html |