IA SF181 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to property taxes and income taxes by modifying the calculation of assessment limitations for certain property, amending provisions relating to certain tax withholding requirements and tax credits, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1056.) Effective date: 02/20/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to property taxes and income taxes by modifying the calculation of assessment limitations for certain property, amending provisions relating to certain tax withholding requirements and tax credits, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1056.) Effective date: 02/20/2023. Applicability date: 01/01/2022, 01/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall amendment H–1020 be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3008 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3008 be adopted? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Shall amendment H–1020 be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3008 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3008 be adopted? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 376. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 364. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 346. |
2023-02-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2023-02-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 356. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays 13. H.J. 315. |
2023-02-15 | House | Amendment H-1020, yeas 36, nays 63, lost. H.J. 314. |
2023-02-15 | House | Unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 314. |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment H-1020 filed. H.J. 310. |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 303. |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 303. |
2023-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Forbes, Harris and Jacoby. H.J. 242. |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 235. |
2023-02-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 217. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 225. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 225. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3007 filed, adopted. S.J. 225. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3008 filed, lost. S.J. 224. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 213. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1056 (Related) 2023-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
HSB120 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Forbes, Harris and Jacoby. H.J. 228.
HSB120 (Related) 2023-02-01 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale, Forbes, Harris and Jacoby. H.J. 228.