IA SF173 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 463.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 463.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to school district property tax replacement payments and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1142.) Effective 3-5-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to school district property tax replacement payments and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1142.) Effective 3-5-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 463. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 449. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 449. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 348. |
2015-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 396. |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 391. |
2015-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee, Highfill, Forristall, and Ruff. H.J. 343. |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 304. |
2015-02-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 303. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 262. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 259. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 242. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 240. |