IA SF170 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the crime of disorderly conduct and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1001.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the crime of disorderly conduct and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1001.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 287. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | HF 232 substituted. S.J. 286. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 232. S.J. 234. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 176. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 166. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1001 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 170.
HSB29 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2239.
HF232 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
HSB29 (Related) 2022-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2239.
HF232 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.