IA SSB1001 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF232
Note: Legislation replaced by SF170

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 170.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the crime of disorderly conduct and making penalties applicable.(See SF 170.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the crime of disorderly conduct and making penalties applicable.(See SF 170.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 170.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-14SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 11:00AM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Bolkcom, and Reichman.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB29 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 232.
HF232 (Replaced by) 2021-02-09 - Message from Senate. H.J. 326.
SF170 (Replaced by) 2021-02-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 287.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback