IA SF127 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Subcommittee reassigned, Dearden, Feenstra, and Sodders. S.J. 152.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Subcommittee reassigned, Dearden, Feenstra, and Sodders. S.J. 152.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the restoration of the right to register to vote and to vote and hold elective office for certain persons and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 2203.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the restoration of the right to register to vote and to vote and hold elective office for certain persons and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (See SF 2203.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Dearden, Feenstra, and Sodders. S.J. 152. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dearden, Sodders, and Whitver. S.J. 200. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 187. |