IA HSB73 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF514
Note: Legislation replaced by SF416
Note: Legislation replaced by SF416
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 385.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 385.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for a repeal.(See HF 514.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for a repeal.(See HF 514.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 385. |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 1:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Forbes and Moore, T.. H.J. 119. |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 117. |
2021-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1111 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 416.
HF514 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF416 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 820.
HF514 (Replaced by) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SF416 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 820.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB73 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB73.html |