IA SF416 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 820.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 820.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for a repeal.(Formerly SSB 1111.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, and providing for a repeal.(Formerly SSB 1111.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 820. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 514 substituted. S.J. 819. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 514. S.J. 438. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 407. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 403. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB73 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 385.
SSB1111 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 416.
HF514 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.
SSB1111 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 416.
HF514 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1038.