IA HSB707 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2595
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2595.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2595.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to traffic violations and enforcement, including the use of an electronic device while driving and the use of automated or remote systems for traffic law enforcement, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2595.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2595. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 286. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 8:15AM RM 304. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Meggers and Meyer, B. H.J. 257. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 255. |
2024-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HF2595 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB707 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB707.html |