IA HSB700 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2559
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to officer disciplinary actions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to officer disciplinary actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 329. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Salmon and Breckenridge. H.J. 294. |
2020-02-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-16 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Dawson, and Kinney. S.J. 623.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB700 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB700.html |