IA HSB693 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2576
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a cause of action for murder in the first degree by causing the death of another by delivering, dispensing, or providing fentanyl or a fentanyl-related substance, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2576.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a cause of action for murder in the first degree by causing the death of another by delivering, dispensing, or providing fentanyl or a fentanyl-related substance, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2576.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2576. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 283. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 8:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Collins and Srinivas. H.J. 246. |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 244. |
2024-02-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2576 (Replaced by) 2024-03-21 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB693 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB693.html |