IA HSB69 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the application fee and annual fee imposed for nonassistance child support cases.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the application fee and annual fee imposed for nonassistance child support cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347. |
2019-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Derry and Hite. H.J. 173. |
2019-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF511 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SSB1211 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF543 (Replaced by) 2019-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 605. S.J. 776.
HF739 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF605 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
SSB1211 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF543 (Replaced by) 2019-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 605. S.J. 776.
HF739 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF605 (Replaced by) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB69 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB69.html |