IA HSB654 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2461
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conveyance of firearms on certain vehicles.(See HF 2461.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conveyance of firearms on certain vehicles.(See HF 2461.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2461. |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 12:30PM RM 304.1. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Carlson and Scholten. H.J. 197. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 196. |
2024-02-05 | House | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2461 (Replaced by) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 242.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB654 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB654.html |