IA HSB625 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2404
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2355
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2355
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2404.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, and mandatory reporter training.(See HF 2404.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, and mandatory reporter training.(See HF 2404.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2404. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 208. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 12:00PM RM 19. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Bergan and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 154. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 152. |
2024-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3124 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2355.
HF2404 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
SF2355 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.
HF2404 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
SF2355 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB625 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB625.html |