IA HF2404 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, mandatory reporter training, and health care coordination and intervention teams, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 625.) Effective date: 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to processes overseen by the department of health and human services, including internal adoption information sharing, dependent adult abuse matters, juvenile justice court filings, mandatory reporter training, and health care coordination and intervention teams, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 625.) Effective date: 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 927. |
2024-04-19 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925. |
2024-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 757. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 764. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 759. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5102. S.J. 759. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5102. S.J. 637. |
2024-03-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 680. |
2024-03-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 676. |
2024-03-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8230, as amended. H.J. 676. |
2024-03-26 | House | Amendment H-8243 to Senate amendment H-8230 adopted. H.J. 676. |
2024-03-25 | House | Amendment H-8243 filed. H.J. 658. |
2024-03-20 | House | Senate amendment H-8230 filed. H.J. 633. |
2024-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 629. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 600. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 599. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-5070 adopted. S.J. 599. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2355. S.J. 599. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5070 filed. S.J. 564. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2355. S.J. 350. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 350. |
2024-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 335. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 495. |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 324. |
2024-02-20 | House | Amendment H-8017 adopted. H.J. 324. |
2024-02-19 | House | Amendment H-8017 filed. H.J. 318. |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB625 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2404.
SSB3124 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2355.
SF2355 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.
SSB3124 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2355.
SF2355 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 600.