IA HSB603 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2363
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2304
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2304
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers.
Title
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, Brink and Kacena. H.J. 165. |
2020-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3025 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2304.
HF2363 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
SF2304 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.
HF2363 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
SF2304 (Replaced by) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB603 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB603.html |