IA SF2304 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers. (Formerly SSB 3025.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers. (Formerly SSB 3025.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 738. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | HF 2363 substituted. S.J. 737. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2363. S.J. 430. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 341. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 334. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3025 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2304.
HSB603 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
HF2363 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
HSB603 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
HF2363 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2304 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2304.html |