IA HF2363 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers. (Formerly HSB 603.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to unemployment insurance contribution rates for certain landscaping employers. (Formerly HSB 603.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 790. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 686. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 739. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 1. S.J. 737. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2304. S.J. 737. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, attached to companion SF 2304. S.J. 430. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 430. |
2020-02-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 383. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 405. |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 7. H.J. 380. |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 258. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3025 (Related) 2020-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2304.
HSB603 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
SF2304 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.
HSB603 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.
SF2304 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 738.