IA HSB603 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF2235
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2394

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure property and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure property and providing penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 275.
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 12:30PM House Lounge
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee: Worthan, Heartsill and Kressig. H.J. 193.
2018-01-31HouseBy COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY

Same As/Similar To

SF2235 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
HF2394 (Replaced by) 2018-03-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SSB3062 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback