IA SF2235 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3062.) Effective 7-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3062.) Effective 7-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 959.
2018-04-16HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 945.
2018-04-03HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 729.
2018-04-03SenateImmediate message. S.J. 858.
2018-04-03SenatePassed Senate, ayes 35, nays 13. S.J. 853.
2018-04-03SenateSenate concurred with S-5198. S.J. 853.
2018-04-03SenateAmendment S-5212 filed, lost. S.J. 852.
2018-04-03SenateAmendment S-5213 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 852.
2018-04-03SenateDeferred. S.J. 847.
2018-03-28SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5198. S.J. 799.
2018-03-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 689.
2018-03-27HousePassed House, ayes 69, nays 31. H.J. 685.
2018-03-27HouseAmendments H-8108, H-8189, H-8190 and H-8191 out of order. H.J. 684.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8320 adopted. H.J. 684.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8328, to H-8320 lost. H.J. 684.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8328, to H-8320 filed. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8327, to H-8320 filed, lost. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8326, to H-8320 filed, lost. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseSubstituted for HF 2394. H.J. 683.
2018-03-26HouseAmendment H-8320 filed. H.J. 679.
2018-03-15HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
2018-03-06HouseAmendments H-8189, H-8190 and H-8191 filed. H.J. 489.
2018-02-26HouseAmendment H-8108 filed. H.J. 395.
2018-02-22HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 356.
2018-02-22HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 354.
2018-02-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 417.
2018-02-21SenatePassed Senate, ayes 33, nays 16. S.J. 414.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5026 filed, lost. S.J. 414.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5036 filed, lost. S.J. 413.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5024 filed, lost. S.J. 412.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5016 withdrawn. S.J. 412.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5023 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 412.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5021 filed, adopted. S.J. 412.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5019 withdrawn. S.J. 412.
2018-02-21SenateAmendment S-5022 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 412.
2018-02-20SenateAmendments S-5016 and S-5019 filed. S.J. 405.
2018-02-19SenateFiscal note.
2018-02-12SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 293.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 285.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3062 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB603 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 275.
HF2394 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback