IA HF2394 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure property and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 603.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to criminal acts committed on or against critical infrastructure property and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 603.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 689.
2018-03-27HouseSF 2235 substituted. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseAmendments H-8254, H-8255 and H-8256 out of order. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8089 adopted. H.J. 683.
2018-03-27HouseAmendment H-8054 withdrawn. H.J. 683.
2018-03-15HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
2018-03-12HouseAmendments H-8254, H-8255 and H-8256 filed. H.J. 568.
2018-02-22HouseAmendment H-8089 filed. H.J. 373.
2018-02-20HouseAmendment H-8054 filed. H.J. 329.
2018-02-20HouseFiscal note.
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 290.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3062 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB603 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 275.
SF2235 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 959.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback