IA HSB59 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF783
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 783.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 783.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of surgical smoke by hospitals, critical access hospitals, and ambulatory surgical centers.(See HF 783.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of surgical smoke by hospitals, critical access hospitals, and ambulatory surgical centers.(See HF 783.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 783. |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 596. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 12:15PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2021 12:15PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Hunter and Meyer, A.. H.J. 108. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 106. |
2021-01-14 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF783 (Replaced by) 2021-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB59 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB59.html |