IA HF783 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of surgical smoke by hospitals, critical access hospitals, and outpatient surgical centers.(Formerly HSB 59.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of surgical smoke by hospitals, critical access hospitals, and outpatient surgical centers.(Formerly HSB 59.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2021 1:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Bolkcom, and Green. S.J. 635. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 577. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 577. |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 2. H.J. 696. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 610. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB59 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 783.