IA HSB584 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2404
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to continuation of or reenrollment in group accident or health care coverage by certain dependents of public employees and including applicability date provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to continuation of or reenrollment in group accident or health care coverage by certain dependents of public employees and including applicability date provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2016-02-15 | House | 2:00PM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-02-08 | House | State Government: Pettengill Chair,Miller, and Winckler. |
2016-02-08 | House | In State Government |
2016-02-08 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3006 (Related) 2016-01-21 - 11:30AM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Commerce.
HF2404 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 456.
HF2404 (Replaced by) 2016-03-11 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 456.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB584 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB584.html |