IA HSB582 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2499
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 320.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to dispensing fees and copayments for partially dispensed quantities of prescription drugs.
Title
A bill for an act relating to dispensing fees and copayments for partially dispensed quantities of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 320. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Brink and Forbes. H.J. 153. |
2020-01-28 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2499 (Replaced by) 2020-06-04 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 681.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB582 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB582.html |